FL H0521 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires mobile home park owner who receives bona fide offer for purchase of park to provide certain notice to homeowners' association.
Title
Mobile Home Parks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0104 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/521 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0521/BillText/Filed/PDF |