FL H0523 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2015-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2015-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises methods available for verifying documents; defines term "reliable electronic means"; authorizes specified officers to administer oaths by reliable electronic means when engaged in performance of official duties.
Title
Notaries Public
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Dave Kerner [D] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] | Rep. Sharon Pritchett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2015-23) |
2015-04-27 | House | Substituted CS/SB 526 |
2015-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2015-03-19 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | CS referred to Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2015-03-18 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-16 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/16/15, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-10 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0526 (Same As) 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-23
H0513 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2015-23)
H0513 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2015-23)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
117 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |