FL H0523 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to take immediate actions to begin reducing the federal debt and to enact legislation requiring a balanced federal budget.
Title
Balancing the Federal Budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-02-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-15 | House | Adopted as amended |
2022-02-15 | House | Amendment 362351 adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-10 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2022) |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-19 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Filed |