FL H0549 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "qualifying project"; deletes provision prohibiting use of tax credits by certain affiliated companies or related entities under certain circumstances; provides maximum amount of capital investment tax credits that may be granted annually.
Title
Capital Investment Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1156 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/549 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0549/BillText/Filed/PDF |