FL H0549 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain activities involving marijuana from use & possession offenses; authorizes persons age 21 & over to engage in certain activities; provides for personal cultivation; specifies possession limits; specifies duties of Division of Alcoholic Beverages, Marijuana, & Tobacco; provides for licensing and regulation of growers, retailers, and others; authorizes establishment of restricted cannabis zones; provides requirements for such zones; provides for sentencing review for certain offenders; authorizes individual convicted of certain crimes to obtain sealing or expunction of his or her criminal history record.
Title
Legalization of Recreational Marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-19 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H551 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H467 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H6021 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S776 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1488 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1884 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S1886 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1471 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
H467 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H6021 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S776 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1488 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1884 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
S1886 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1471 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 485 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 1605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
386 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 708 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 0131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 20331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 20332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 20333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 20334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 20485 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2049 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2069 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 2074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 3011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 3012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 3013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 3014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 3015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 3016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 3017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 3018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 3019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 4501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 4601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 4701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 4801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 4805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 5701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 5801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 0073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 174 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 176 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
832 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
877 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
932 | 7055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0586 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0595 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/549 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/549/BillText/Filed/PDF |