FL H0553 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 330 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 330 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that it is violation of Florida Election Code for candidate to falsely represent military service; permits any person to file complaint with Florida Election Commission; provides for adoption of rules for expedited hearing proceedings; requires assessment of civil penalty for candidate found to have misrepresented military service.
Title
Violations of the Florida Election Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 330 (Ch. | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 615 | |
2011-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable by Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 3 -HJ 452 | |
2011-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee, 04/05/11, 3:00 pm, 306 HOB | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 368 | |
2011-03-25 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/29/11, 12:00 pm, 306 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 51 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 51 | |
2011-01-28 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0330 () 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/553 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0553/BillText/Filed/HTML |