FL H0555 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 336 (Ch. 2013-168)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 336 (Ch. 2013-168)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies that the proceeds of the tax may be used for the benefit of certain museums or aquariums.
Title
Tourist Development Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 336 (Ch. 2013-168) |
2013-04-30 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 336 |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13 |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/28/13, 10:30 am, Reed Hall |
2013-03-14 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Favorable by Finance and Tax Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Subcommittee, 03/14/13, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2013-03-06 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Subcommittee |
2013-03-06 | House | Favorable by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/06/13, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0336 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-168
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/555 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0555/BillText/Filed/PDF |