FL H0559 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires adoption entities to submit annual report with certain information to DCF; requires department to retain electronic copy of certain documentation; revises amount of authorized fees, costs, & expenses; prohibits & authorizes court to reject certain fees; requires court to include written determination of reasonableness if court approves fees, costs, & expenses in excess of certain limits; requires certain information to be included in annual report department submits to Governor & Legislature; revises provisions relating to the statewide adoption exchange.
Title
Adoptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-05 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2023-11-30 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-11-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1083 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Chapter No. 2024-177; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 958 (Ch. 2024-90)
S1486 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1083
S1486 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1083
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 1662 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 167 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 039 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 097 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/559 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/559/BillText/Filed/PDF |