FL H0587 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits new or retained professional sport franchise that uses facility that receives certain distributions of public funds or franchise's league from preventing television or radio broadcasts of games in facility due to insufficient ticket sales; provides that sports franchise is subject to fine by county in which facility is located if broadcasts of game are prohibited; requires that proceeds of fine be used to purchase tickets to games of sports franchise at publicly financed facility for specified individuals & their families.
Title
New or Retained Professional Sports Franchises
Sponsors
Rep. James Grant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 59 | |
2011-11-15 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 59 | |
2011-11-08 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/587 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0587/BillText/Filed/HTML |