FL H0587 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires FWCC to establish pilot program for eradication of certain invasive species & to submit report to Governor & Legislature; requires certain nonnative species to be implanted with passive integrated transponder before sale, resale, or offer for sale by pet dealers.
Title
Nonnative Animals
Sponsors
House Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | Rep. Halsey Beshears [R] | Rep. Kristin Jacobs [D] | Rep. Tom Leek [R] |
Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R] | Rep. Holly Raschein [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#254 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/19/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-04-07 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-03 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/03/17, 11:30 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 03/07/17, 4:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0230 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
379 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 2311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |