FL H0587 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides public records exemption for termination-of-access reports filed by financial institutions with OFR, for information contained in such reports, & for personally identifying & personal financial information contained in complaints filed by customers or members & in determinations issued by office related to such complaints & reports; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statements of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Access to Financial Institution Customer Accounts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-02-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-15 | House | CS passed; YEAS 119, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-15 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-12 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024) |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-09 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2024-01-24 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-20 | House | Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-12-20 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2023-12-13 | House | Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2023-12-06 | House | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2023-11-30 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2023-11-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H585 (Related) 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
S1132 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1132 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance