FL H0595 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the tax rate of the excise tax on certain aviation fuels; deleting an excise tax exemption for certain aviation fuel delivered by wholesalers or terminal suppliers that increase the state's workforce by certain amounts, etc.
Title
Aviation
Sponsors
House Economic Affairs Committee | House Finance and Tax Committee | Rep. George Moraitis [R] | Sen. Frank Artiles [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#150 (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Finance and Tax; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-16 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 108 NAYS 3 |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (942787) |
2015-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15 |
2015-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-10 | House | CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-09 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-08 | House | CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-06 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, Reed Hall |
2015-04-03 | House | CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-03 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-31 | House | CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 4 |
2015-03-27 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 03/31/15, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-03-04 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 4:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0722 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
H7141 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
H7141 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
206 | 9825 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 9850 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1259 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |