FL H0601 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires district school boards to provide transportation for each public elementary school student if student's single parent or guardian is developmentally disabled.
Title
Public School Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S472 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/601 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/601/BillText/Filed/PDF |