FL H0665 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes, rather than requires, OFR to deny mortgage broker license application if applicant had mortgage broker license revoked previously; authorizes, rather than requires, OFR to deny mortgage lender license application if applicant had mortgage lender license revoked previously; revises procedures & requirements for submitting fingerprints as part of an application to sell, or offer to sell, securities; removes conflicting language; revises procedures & requirements for submitting fingerprints to apply for license as money services business; requires OFR to pay annual fee to FDLE; removes conflicting language; requires certain licensees to submit live-scan fingerprints before next renewal period.
Title
Licensure by Office of Financial Regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Travis Hutson [R] | Rep. Ricardo Rangel [D] | Rep. Ritch Workman [R] | House Regulatory Affairs Committee |
House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Mike LaRosa [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#164 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#164 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Chapter No. 2013-201 | |
2013-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-03 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-30 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 644 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13 |
2013-04-01 | House | CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-27 | House | CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 03/27/13, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB |
2013-03-20 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/20/13, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2013-03-12 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-11 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-06 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/06/13, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0644 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 665 (Ch. 2013-201)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
494 | 00321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |