FL H0667 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1059
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1059
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act "Deputy John C. Mecklenburg Act"; provides that unlawful killing of human being when committed by person engaged in perpetration of, or in attempt to perpetrate, offense of aggravated fleeing or eluding with serious bodily injury or death is murder of specified degree in certain circumstances; requires life imprisonment for defendants convicted of specified offenses where victim is correctional officer, correctional probation officer, or related type of officer; conforms provisions; reenacts provisions.
Title
Murder
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#893 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#893 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1059 | |
2012-03-02 | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 1 -SJ 775 | |
2012-03-02 | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Budget -SJ 775 | |
2012-03-01 | Received -SJ 761 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Budget -SJ 761 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 788 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 787 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 732 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-06 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 525 | |
2012-02-02 | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time -HJ 447 | |
2012-02-02 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-01 | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 456 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/01/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 281 | |
2012-01-25 | Original reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | |
2012-01-24 | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 260 | |
2012-01-24 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 262 | |
2012-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 66 | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 66 | |
2011-11-15 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 0823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |