FL H0667 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that specified persons are immune from civil liability for damages for complying with request to release TJ Alert information to appropriate agencies; provides good faith presumption for certain actions; authorizes only law enforcement agency having jurisdiction over case to request that Missing Endangered Persons Information Clearinghouse activate state TJ Alert involving missing person who is suspected by law enforcement agency of meeting TJ Alert criteria.
Title
Missing Person Investigations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0708 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
937 | 0201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/667 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0667/BillText/Filed/PDF |