FL H0677 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes domestic reciprocal insurer to return portion of unassigned funds to subscribers; provides limitations.
Title
Reciprocal Insurers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/15 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/01/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-05 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 4:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0678 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1094 (Ch. 2015-69)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/677 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0677/BillText/Filed/PDF |