FL H0683 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows registered patients & designated caregivers to purchase, acquire, & possess medical-grade marijuana subject to specified requirements; allows cultivation & processing licensee, employee, or contractor to acquire, cultivate, transport, & sell marijuana; allows retail licensee to purchase, receive, possess, store, dispense, & deliver marijuana; prohibits certain actions regarding acquisition, possession, transfer, use, & administration of marijuana; clarifies that person is prohibited from driving under influence of marijuana; provides duties of DOH; provides implementation requirements; specifies act does not require or restrict health insurance coverage for purchase of medical-grade marijuana.
Title
Medical Use of Marijuana
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] | Rep. John Wood [R] | Rep. Dwight Dudley [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] |
Rep. Paul Renner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0528 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1097 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H1097 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 99 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 992 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 994 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 997 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 998 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 999 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 9991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/683 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0683/BillText/Filed/PDF |