FL H0687 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises values used in classification of thefts from persons age 65 or older; provides more severe ranking under Criminal Punishment Code for specified communications fraud violations involving victims age 65 or older; provides minimum mandatory sentences for specified white collar crime offenses; provides additional minimum mandatory sentences for certain offenses based on number of victims.
Title
Theft Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 67 | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 67 | |
2011-11-16 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 0844 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 0145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/687 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0687/BillText/Filed/HTML |