FL H0691 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 982; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 982 (Ch. 2010-100) -HJ 01128
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 982; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 982 (Ch. 2010-100) -HJ 01128
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits municipalities, counties, districts, & other local governments from enacting certain ordinances or rules relating to underground facilities; revises responsibilities of excavators & underground facility operators, procedures for notification through Sunshine State One-Call of Florida, Inc., violations, citation procedures, hearings, & penalties; provides jurisdiction to DOAH for disposition of certain violations, etc.
Title
Underground Facility Damage Prevention & Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 982; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 982 (Ch. 2010-100) -HJ 01128 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading -HJ 00952 | |
2010-04-13 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00676 | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00676 | |
2010-04-07 | On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 04/09/10, 11:45 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00407; Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00407 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/25/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00379; Now in Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) -HJ 00379 | |
2010-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 03/22/10, 3:15 pm, Reed Hall | |
2010-03-11 | Now in Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP) -HJ 00266 | |
2010-03-09 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-10 | CS read 1st time on 03/10/10 -HJ 00254 | |
2010-03-03 | CS by Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00235 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00063; On Committee agenda-- Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC), 03/03/10, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC), 03/03/10, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); General Government Policy Council | |
2010-01-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0982 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-100
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0556 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0556 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0556 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0556 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0556 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0556 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0556 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0556 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0556 | 114 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0556 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0556 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |