FL H0691 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes resilience-related advisory committees to conduct public meetings & workshops by means of communications media technology; provides that use of technology by committee member constitutes member's presence at meeting or workshop; provides notice requirements for public meetings or workshops conducted by means of communications media technology.
Title
Resilience-related Advisory Committees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-11-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S690 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/691 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/691/BillText/Filed/PDF |