FL H0697 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 388 (Ch. 2021-119)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 388 (Ch. 2021-119)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes licensed life support services to transport injured police canines under certain circumstances; authorizes paramedic or emergency medical technician to provide emergency medical care to injured police canines; provides for immunity from criminal & civil liability.
Title
Injured Police Canines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 388 (Ch. 2021-119) |
2021-04-14 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-03-24 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-17 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-16 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-16 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S388 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Chapter No. 2021-119
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
401 | 254 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |