FL H0703 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 652 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 652 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Saves from future repeal provisions that provide spaceflight entities with immunity from liability for loss, damage, or death of participant resulting from inherent risks of spaceflight activities; includes certain manufacturers & suppliers within meaning of spaceflight entity.
Title
Liability of Spaceflight Entities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 652 (Ch. | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 590 | |
2011-04-05 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-03-29 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 366 | |
2011-03-28 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-23 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 341 | |
2011-03-21 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/23/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 240 | |
2011-03-11 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/15/11, 12:30 pm, 12 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 61 | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 61 | |
2011-02-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0652 () 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851