FL H0717 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides definitions & intent with respect to certain requirements relating to provision of outsourced human services related to mental health, substance abuse, child welfare, or juvenile justice; requires acceptance by state agencies of national accreditation of providers of such human services in lieu of, & as substitute for, specified agency licensing, administrative, & program requirements, etc.
Title
Procurement of Contractual Services/State Agency
Sponsors
Rep. Juan Zapata [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00066 | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-01-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1584 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0216 | 136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0287 | 0575 | New Code | See Bill Text |