FL H0717 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "conversion therapy"; prohibits person who is licensed to provide professional counseling or practitioner who is licensed under provisions regulating practice of medicine, osteopathic medicine, psychology, clinical social work, marriage & family therapy, or mental health counseling from practicing or performing conversion therapy with an individual who is younger than specified age; provides that such person or practitioner is subject to specified disciplinary proceedings.
Title
Conversion Therapy
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. David Silvers [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] |
Rep. David Richardson [D] | Rep. Carlos Smith [D] | Rep. Clovis Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S68 (Same As) 2017-11-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S696 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
S696 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/717 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/717/BillText/Filed/PDF |