FL H0721 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain housing authorities to adopt certain rules or policies relating to dangerous dogs; removes exemption for local ordinances adopted before specified date which pertain to dogs that have bitten or attacked persons or domestic animals.
Title
Authorization of Restrictions Concerning Dangerous Dogs
Sponsors
House Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Committee | Rep. James Buchanan [R] | Rep. Linda Chaney [R] | Rep. Alejandro Rizo [R] |
Rep. Dana Trabulsy [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in State Affairs Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-08 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-13 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-13 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | PCS added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S614 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages