FL H0723 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides motor vehicle insurance requirements for peer-to-peer car sharing; provides that peer-to-peer car-sharing programs have insurable interest in shared vehicles in specified periods; authorizes peer-to-peer car-sharing programs to own & maintain certain policies of motor vehicle insurance; provides liabilities; requires shared vehicle owners' insurers to indemnify peer-to-peer car-sharing programs under certain circumstances; provides exemptions from vicarious liabilities; authorizes motor vehicle insurance policies to exclude specified coverages; authorizes specified insurers to seek contributions against indemnifications; provides requirements for notifications of implications of liens; requires specified disclosures to shared vehicle drivers & owners; provides requirements for verification & notification relating to motor vehicle safety recalls.
Title
Peer-to-peer Car Sharing
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-27 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 4 |
2020-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-02-13 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 2 |
2020-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-30 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | CS referred to State Affairs Committee; Commerce Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-28 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-11-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H377 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
S478 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S478 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance