FL H0737 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 46 (Ch. 2021-166)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 46 (Ch. 2021-166)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes craft distilleries to be licensed as specified vendors under certain circumstances; requires certain alcoholic beverages to be obtained through licensed distributor; prohibits distillery from operating as craft distillery until certain requirements are met; authorizes persons to have common ownership in craft distilleries under certain circumstances; requires minimum percentage of craft distillery's total finished branded products to be distilled in this state & contain one or more Florida agricultural products.
Title
Craft Distilleries
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Sen. Nick DiCeglie [R] | Rep. Kevin Chambliss [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Fetterhoff [R] |
Rep. Tom Leek [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 46 (Ch. 2021-166) |
2021-04-13 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 46 |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021) |
2021-03-26 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-24 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-11 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-04 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-02 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-26 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S46 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-166
S142 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 46 (Ch. 2021-166), CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30)
S142 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 46 (Ch. 2021-166), CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
565 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
565 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
565 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |