FL H0747 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that health care providers & health care payers have right to not participate in or pay for any health care services that violate their consciences; prohibits person from taking or threatening to take adverse action against such providers & payers for specified actions; provides for civil remedies & damages; provides immunity from civil, criminal, & administrative liability for such providers & payers under certain circumstances.
Title
Protections of Medical Conscience
Sponsors
Rep. John Snyder [R] | Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-26 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-11-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1820 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy