FL H0763 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Purple Heart recipient is eligible to receive lifetime family annual entrance pass to state parks at no charge; requires DOT to establish prepaid toll account for eligible Purple Heart recipients; authorizes Purple Heart recipient to apply for account; requires applicant to provide specified documentation to department.
Title
Fee and Toll Waivers for Purple Heart Recipients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-01-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0958 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
258 | 0145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/763 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0763/BillText/Filed/PDF |