FL H0773 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits state group insurance program from imposing on enrollee any cost-sharing requirement with respect to coverage for diagnostic breast examinations & supplemental breast examinations.
Title
Coverage for Diagnostic and Supplemental Breast Examinations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Select Committee on Health Innovation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Select Committee on Health Innovation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2024-02-06 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-05 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-05 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported out of Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-02-02 | House | Favorable with CS by Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-31 | House | PCS added to Select Committee on Health Innovation agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-27 | House | Now in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2023-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S132 (Similar To) 2023-11-17 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S932 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
S932 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 12303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |