FL H0861 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends & enlarges boundaries of district.
Title
North Springs Improvement District, Broward County
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#66 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1003 | |
2011-05-02 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 648 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Local Calendar, 05/02/11 | |
2011-04-28 | Received -SJ 575 | |
2011-04-27 | In Messages | |
2011-04-27 | Read 2nd time -HJ 820 | |
2011-04-25 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 590 | |
2011-04-05 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-04-04 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 409 | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 409 | |
2011-03-30 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 04/01/11, 8:45 am, Webster Hall | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 74 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 74 | |
2011-02-21 | Filed |