FL H0861 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends definition of "public utility" to include municipalities that purchase or receive power from entity created under Florida Interlocal Cooperation Act of 1969; amends definition of "electric utility" to exempt municipalities that purchase or receive power from entity created under Florida Interlocal Cooperation Act of 1969 .
Title
Municipal Power Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1294 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/861 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0861/BillText/Filed/PDF |