FL H0861 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes excise tax upon bottled water operators; establishes requirements for such tax; requires local governments to cooperate with department & furnish information without cost to DOR for certain purposes; provides criminal penalties.
Title
Bottled Water Excise Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Ways and Means Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means Committee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1112 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
211 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/861 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/861/BillText/Filed/PDF |