FL H0913 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers certain state property lying within City of West Park, Broward County, to be used by city for purposes of open space & public recreation needs; declares such use public purpose; provides for reversion to state if used for any other purpose.
Title
Ownership of State Lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 88 | |
2011-12-21 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 88 | |
2011-12-06 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/913 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0913/BillText/Filed/HTML |