FL H0915 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes FWCC to adopt specified rules for vessel safety inspection decals.
Title
Vessel Safety Inspection Decals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1132 |
2018-03-06 | House | Substituted CS/SB 1132 |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18 |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/18/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-10 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Favorable by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1132 (Same As) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-27
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/915 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/915/BillText/Filed/PDF |