FL H0917 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Healthy Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Healthy Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DCF or local licensing agency to give copy of inspection report of licensed child care facility, at no cost, to each parent whose child attends the facility within specified period after report is completed & accepted by DCF or local licensing agency.
Title
Inspection of Licensed Child Care Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Healthy Families Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Healthy Families Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0416 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/917 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0917/BillText/Filed/PDF |