FL H0927 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3-2)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 770
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 770
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes program administrator to offer program for financing qualifying improvements for commercial & residential property; creates seller's disclosure statements for properties offered for sale which have assessments on them for qualifying improvements; requires any financing agreement executed be submitted for recording in public records of county where property is located; prohibits recorded financing agreement from being removed from attachment to property; requires program administrator comply with act & any related contracts, agreements, or interlocal agreements be amended to comply with act.
Title
Improvements to Real Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 770 |
2024-03-01 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 770 |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024) |
2024-02-27 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024) |
2024-02-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3) |
2024-02-21 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2024-02-16 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-15 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | PCS added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2024-02-02 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-01 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Favorable with CS by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee |
2024-01-26 | House | Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S770 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Chapter No. 2024-273
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 086 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |