FL H0937 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires chief judge of each judicial circuit to establish military veterans & servicemembers court program; requires chief judge to consider nationally recognized best practices when adopting policies & procedures for program.
Title
Military Veterans and Servicemembers Court Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1226 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S7072 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S7072 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/937 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/937/BillText/Filed/PDF |