FL H0941 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for reclassification of offenses committed while in possession of firearm or weapon capable of holding more than 10 rounds of ammunition or in possession of firearm & more than one magazine for firearm.
Title
Reclassification of Offenses Involving Certain Firearms or Additional Firearm Magazines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1584 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/941 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0941/BillText/Filed/PDF |