FL H0957 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to sale or distribution of hearing aids through mail.
Title
Hearing Aid Sales and Distribution
Sponsors
House Professions and Public Health Subcommittee | Rep. Jim Mooney [R] | Rep. Adam Botana [R] | Rep. Lawrence McClure [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-04-01 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | PCS added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S700 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
468 | 1265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |