FL H0961 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises conditions under which person commits offense of DUI or BUI; provides affirmative defense; revises penalties for offenses of DUI & BUI manslaughter; revises condition that must be met before person arrested for DUI or BUI may be released from custody; authorizes law enforcement witness to give certain testimony; revises conditions that constitute conviction; requires clerk of court to notify FDLE when such conditions have been met; requires FDLE to maintain records thereof; creates rebuttable presumptions; provides additional grounds for issuance of search warrant; revises conditions under which 1 year of probation may be ordered for misdemeanor offenses.
Title
Operating Vehicles and Vessels Under the Influence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1172 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 1932 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 1933 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 1939 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 645 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 359 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 749 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 960 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
933 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/961 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/961/BillText/Filed/PDF |