FL H1001 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expands eligibility for certain prorated refund.
Title
Exemptions for Totally and Permanently Disabled Veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) |
2023-04-11 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-07 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2023-03-29 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-27 | House | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-21 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-20 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-20 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-28 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1052 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
H7063 (Similar To) 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-157
H7063 (Similar To) 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-157