FL H1019 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain legal or administrative entities to conduct public meetings & workshops by communications media technology; revises criteria under which legal entities may conduct public meetings & workshops.
Title
Administrative Entity Telecommunication Meetings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S972 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1019 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1019/BillText/Filed/PDF |