FL H1041 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises shipping documentation requirements for specified sales of tobacco products; removes tobacco offenses from driver license penalties for persons under age 18; revises prohibited age related to sale, delivery, gift, possession, & purchase of tobacco products; provides & revises penalties.
Title
Tobacco Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1013 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S734 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S1046 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H1125 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Laid on Table
S1618 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
S1574 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7119 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S734 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S1046 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H1125 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Laid on Table
S1618 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
S1574 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7119 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 0075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
877 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1041 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1041/BillText/Filed/PDF |