FL H1045 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises manner in which presidential electors are nominated, elected, & vote; provides that one elector shall be elected from each congressional district & two electors shall be elected at large, based upon which candidate wins majority of congressional district seats; provides conforming provisions.
Title
Presidential Electors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Ethics and Elections Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0075 (Same As) 2014-01-16 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1516 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S1516 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
103 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
103 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
103 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
103 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1045 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1045/BillText/Filed/PDF |