FL H1045 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies rights of children in out-of-home care; provides roles & responsibilities for certain persons & entities; requires that case plan be developed in face-to-face conference with caregiver of child; provides additional requirements for content & distribution of case plan; requires caseworker to provide specified information relating to certain subsidies to caregivers of certain children; provides requirements for social study reports, caregivers, licensure & operation of family foster homes, residential child-caring facilities, & child-placing agencies; requires lead agency, rather than department, to provide caregivers with contact when caseworker is unavailable; requires lead agencies to recruit & retain foster homes.
Title
Child Welfare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-12-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S496 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 4085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 4088 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1753 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 988 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1045 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1045/BillText/Filed/PDF |