FL H1051 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements & public meetings requirements for unsolicited proposals held by responsible public entity for specified period; provides definition; requires recording to be made of closed meeting; provides exemption from public record requirements of records generated during a closed meeting for a specified period; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Public Records & Public Meetings/Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/14, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2014-03-27 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/27/14, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-03-20 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-17 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-12 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/12/14, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1318 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages