FL H1055 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definitions of terms "covered policy," "retention," & "corporation"; provides for calculation of insurer's reimbursement premium & retention under reimbursement contract; revises coverage levels available under reimbursement contract; revises aggregate coverage limits; provides for phase-in of changes to coverage levels & limits; changes name of Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund Finance Corporation; repeals provisions relating to temporary emergency options for additional coverage; provides for recoupment of certain costs of reinsurance.
Title
Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60) |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0909 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60), SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
H1107 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
S1262 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
S1770 (Similar To) 2013-05-29 - Chapter No. 2013-60, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
H1107 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
S1262 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
S1770 (Similar To) 2013-05-29 - Chapter No. 2013-60, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0629 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1055 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1055/BillText/Filed/PDF |