FL H1059 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOE to create uniform, statewide identification badge to be worn by noninstructional contractors signifying that contractor has met specified requirements; requires school districts to issue identification badge to qualified contractor; provides that identification badge shall be recognized by all school districts; requires DOE to determine uniform cost school district may charge contractor for receipt of identification badge, which shall be borne by contractor.
Title
Background Screening for Noninstructional Contractors on School Grounds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#956 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Budget -SJ 826 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 826 | |
2012-02-29 | In Messages | |
2012-02-29 | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 936 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -HJ 935 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 889 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12 | |
2012-02-23 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 815 | |
2012-02-23 | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 815 | |
2012-02-21 | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/23/12, 8:30 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-14 | Now in Education Committee -HJ 602 | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 602 | |
2012-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/14/12, 11:30 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-31 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 318 | |
2012-01-30 | CS by K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 306 | |
2012-01-30 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-25 | CS by K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 310 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee, 01/25/12, 8:30 am, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 103 | |
2011-12-28 | Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 104 | |
2011-12-16 | Filed |